Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing Authorities - Transparency and Baltimore Authority Bidding Process
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a housing authority established to undertake specified housing projects to establish a specified Web site; requiring the Web site to contain specified information related to the membership, operation, and budget of the authority; providing that the Housing Authority of Baltimore City is a Baltimore City agency for purposes of specified procurement regulations issued by the Board of Estimates of Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing Authorities - Transparency and Baltimore Authority Bidding Process
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-406, 15-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM