Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Arentz, Cane, Eckardt, Haddaway-Riccio, Otto, Proctor, Rudolph, and Smigiel
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee; providing for the credit structure for the energy generated from an energy-generating cooperative; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to present a report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015, including information regarding energy-generating cooperatives and the most efficient, cost-effective, and environmentally sound methods for utilizing poultry litter; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313890/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {313890/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM