Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Davis, Kelly, Kramer, W. Miller, S. Robinson, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a critical incident stress management team member from disclosing specified communications or information acquired from a law enforcement officer, a correctional officer, or an emergency responder in the course of providing critical incident stress management services; prohibiting a critical incident stress management team member from being compelled to testify in specified proceedings or investigations; establishing exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0461 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM