Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Salary of Part-Time Liquor Inspectors PG 316-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified technical corrections to clarify that the annual salary of part-time liquor inspectors in Prince George's County is $10,900.
Details
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423894/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Benson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments {423894/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Benson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-109, 15-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM