Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Gilchrist
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information that a purchaser must receive before a contract for the sale or resale of a unit in a condominium or a lot in a homeowners association may be enforced by the vendor or seller; altering the time period within which a purchaser may cancel a contract for the sale or resale of a unit or lot without stating a reason and without liability on the part of the purchaser; altering the time period within which a council of unit owners must furnish a specified certificate to a unit owner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0820
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-126, 11-135, 11-135.1, 11B-105, 11B-106, 11B-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM