Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a manufacturer of a certain product to disclose certain information on the label of the product and on the website of the manufacturer under certain circumstances beginning January 1, 2021; requiring a manufacturer of a certain product to make certain information available in a certain format; providing that a manufacturer of a certain product may protect and is not required to disclose certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4101 through 14-4109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM