Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Buckel, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Grammer, Jackson, Kerr, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Metzgar, Qi, Shoemaker, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying a certain time frame within which a certain franchisor is required to notify a franchisee of an intention to terminate or refuse to renew a beer franchise agreement; exempting certain franchisors from a prohibition against terminating or refusing to continue to renew a beer franchise agreement without good cause under certain circumstances; providing for the submission of a certain matter to arbitration and for its application and enforcement in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813395/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {363323/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {813395/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {363323/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-107, 5-108, 5-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM