Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Afzali, Carr, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, McMillan, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, Ebersole, Hornberger, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2016-2017 school year; providing that the purpose of the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification is to recognize local school systems that create, implement, and enforce school start times that are consistent with the school start times recommended by the Department, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, and the American Academy of Pediatrics; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785460/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {785460/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM