Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Charkoudian, D.M. Davis, Gilchrist, Lehman, McKay, Moon, Solomon, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain annual appropriation for local health services funding beginning in fiscal year 2021; providing for the distribution of a certain appropriation for local health services funding for fiscal year 2021; modifying the calculation of local health services funding beginning in fiscal year 2022; prohibiting State funding to a subdivision for local health services from being less than the subdivision received in fiscal year 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301, 2-302, 2-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM