Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of a real-time digital spotter by law enforcement agencies to detect and enforce vehicle laws governing speeding, the use of wireless communications devices, and the use of seat belts; prohibiting the use of a real-time digital spotter in a local jurisdiction unless authorized by the governing body by local law adopted after reasonable notice and a public hearing; reducing certain fines for violations of the vehicle laws governing the use of wireless communications devices and seat belts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0863
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:21 PM
Click to return on the top page