Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 312-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing in Prince George's County specified volunteer fire departments and organizations that promote the arts and preserve the culture to hold events in which the public may play poker card games; limiting the number of poker events that may be held to one a month; requiring that a permit be obtained from the Prince George's County Department of Environmental Resources before a poker event may be held; specifying requirements to qualify for a permit; specifying the contents of an application for a permit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0811 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1902, 13-1912, 13-1913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM