Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Glenn, Kaiser, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Design Excellence Commission; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study, develop specified plans and programs, and establish specified events regarding design excellence initiatives; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-468 through 10-470 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM