Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Frush, Gilchrist, Lafferty, McIntosh, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified distributors, on or before January 1, 2015, to establish or participate in a program, approved by the Department of the Environment, for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; requiring specified owners and managers of bars and restaurants, beginning January 1, 2015, to separate, store, and arrange for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0389 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1712 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM