Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Acevero, Anderson, Chang, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, W. Fisher, Glenn, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Jackson, Korman, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the General Assembly finds that all State residents have a right to health care; providing it is the intent of the General Assembly to establish a comprehensive universal single-payer health care coverage program and a health care cost control system; establishing Healthy Maryland as a public corporation and a unit of State government to provide comprehensive universal health coverage for every State resident; requiring Healthy Maryland to provide certain services for residents of the State by January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-101 through 25-1204 )
(   31-101, 31-104, 31-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM