Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Compound Drugs - Provision to Ophthalmologists for Office Use
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacy for which a pharmacy permit has been issued by the State Board of Pharmacy and a sterile compounding facility to provide to an ophthalmologist for office use, without a patient-specific prescription, specified compound drugs for specified purposes; requiring sterile compounding facility to require the ophthalmologist to provide to the sterile compounding facility the identity of any patient to whom the drugs are administered; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {286180/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {286180/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {374339/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-403, 12-4A-12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM