Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Hixson, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, S. Robinson, Tarlau, Turner, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting coordinated expenditures between candidates and outside spending organizations, as specified; specifying parameters, limitations, and exceptions regarding coordinated expenditures between candidates and outside spending organizations; specifying penalties; providing for the joint and several liability of specified persons for penalties; requiring that specified penalties imposed and collected be deposited in the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-248 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM