Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Enforcement, and Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, A. Miller, and Morales
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board under specified circumstances to issue specified orders and impose specified civil penalties not to exceed specified amounts; altering the annual reporting requirement of the Board to require that specified data on complaints and violations be reported; expanding the scope of the training requirements under the Open Meetings Act to include all officers of a public body; requiring a public body to report specified open meetings training information to the Board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-204, 3-209, 3-210, 3-211, 3-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM