Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Rosenberg, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Information Technology, or the Secretary's designee, by January 1, 2020, to adopt new nonvisual access procurement standards that provide an individual with disabilities with nonvisual access so the individual can acquire the same information, engage in the same interactions, and enjoy the same services as users without disabilities; requiring the nonvisual access standards to be consistent with certain federal standards; requiring a certain nonvisual access clause to include a certain statement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {906183/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {906183/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {364438/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Text - Chapter - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-301, 3A-303, 3A-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM