Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation (By Request - Orphans' Court Judges)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of each judge of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County and the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County to $33,000 for calendar year 2015 and each subsequent calendar year; providing the Chief Judge shall receive an additional $2,000 annually; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {352511/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {352511/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM