Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barron, Carter, Dumais, Frush, Jackson, Kelly, McComas, Moon, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum fine to which a person is subject on conviction of procuring or soliciting or offering to procure or solicit for prostitution or assignation; requiring specified fines to be remitted to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to fund services for victims of human trafficking; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0865
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM