Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Korman, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, J. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain requirements for the appointment and removal of the inspector general of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority by the Board of Directors of the Authority; specifying certain powers and requirements of the inspector general; requiring the Office of the Inspector General to be funded with a grant of at least 0.05% of the annual operating budget of the Authority; requiring that the Office of the Inspector General be operationally and functionally independent of the Authority; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0894
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {497670/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM