Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Acevero, Ebersole, Forbes, Hill, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified position" for purposes of eligibility under the job creation tax credit program; applying the Act to job creation tax credits certified after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-301, 6-303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:19 PM