Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transit Vehicles - Prohibited Acts - Use of Obscene Language
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Anderson, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting individuals from using obscene language in transit vehicles and trains owned or controlled by the Maryland Transit Administration or operated by a railroad company under contract to the Administration; limiting the Act to the operator of and passengers in transit vehicles with a seating capacity of 20 or more individuals; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0528 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM