Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Substance Use Treatment - Inpatient and Intensive Outpatient Programs - Consent by Minor
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Afzali, Barron, Ciliberti, Folden, Krimm, Vogt, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing parents or specified guardians to apply, on behalf of a minor, for admission of the minor to a certified intensive outpatient alcohol and drug abuse program; requiring specified programs to make a specified note on an application for admission in order for an individual to be retained for specified treatment; providing that specified programs have the right to discharge an individual admitted for specified treatment if the individual is not complying with the policies and procedures of the treatment program or the facility; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Substance Use Treatment - Inpatient and Intensive Outpatient Programs - Consent by Minor
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {436086/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Substance Use Treatment - Inpatient and Intensive Outpatient Programs - Consent by Minor
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-102, 8-502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM