Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations
Sponsored by
Delegates Conaway and Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court that finds that a citation for an alleged violation recorded by a speed monitoring system in Baltimore City was issued erroneously to require the person responsible for maintaining the speed monitoring system to pay a penalty of $250 to the person to whom the citation was issued.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM