Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting under criminal law a person that distributes tobacco products for commercial purposes from distributing to a minor an electronic nicotine delivery system; prohibiting under criminal law certain persons from purchasing for or selling an electronic nicotine delivery system to a minor; prohibiting under criminal law certain minors from using, possessing, obtaining, or attempting to obtain an electronic nicotine delivery system; establishing a criminal penalty for distribution of nicotine delivery systems to minors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943093/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {943093/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Text - Chapter - Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-107, 10-108 )
(   24-305, 24-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM