Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Morhaim, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that the award of damages when land, or any part of it, is taken in a specified condemnation proceeding by specified entities is three times the fair market value of the part taken; authorizing that the fair market value of property in condemnation proceedings by specified entities be determined in a specified manner; requiring the condemnation authority to pay all costs of a specified appraisal; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 12-105, 12-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM