Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Counseling Program - Counseling Services - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Carr, Frick, Hettleman, Jackson, Jalisi, Krimm, Lafferty, McIntosh, Patterson, Sample-Hughes, Turner, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to require the School Counseling Program in the county to provide counseling services to students during the entire calendar year; requiring the county board, in consultation with specified public schools, to determine student needs for counseling services during a specified period of time and to develop a specified plan; and requiring a county board to submit a specified report to the State Department of Education on or before July 1 each year.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-401.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM