Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Table Games - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Reducing, by 0.2%, the percentage of the proceeds of table games at a video lottery facility that a video lottery operation licensee retains for each additional table game the licensee adds on or after July 1, 2016, under specified circumstances; increasing, by 0.2%, the percentage of the proceeds of table games at a video lottery facility paid by the Comptroller to the Education Trust Fund under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM