Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, McKay, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified health care practitioners to use teletherapy for a specified patient under specified circumstances; establishing specified requirements for the technology a health care practitioner uses for teletherapy; requiring a health care practitioner to make a specified identification and establish a safety protocol that includes specified information before the first teletherapy session; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-901 through 1-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM