Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate Hettleman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 835
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain private career schools, for-profit institutions of higher education, and certain institutions of higher education required to register with the Maryland Higher Education Commission under certain circumstances from enrolling certain students in certain programs under certain circumstances; requiring certain schools or institutions to provide to certain students certain information before the student signs an enrollment agreement, completes registration, or makes a financial commitment to the school or institution; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0795
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-15)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 835
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Private Career Schools and For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {464161/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (121-15) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 835
Text - Chapter - Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
(   13-320 )
(   11-202.2, 11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page