Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement Exemptions - Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Repacking Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Television)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from specified provisions of the State procurement law procurement by the Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission for procurement contracts needed to implement the repacking requirements of the federal Spectrum Act; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2020.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM