Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Gutierrez, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a specified affidavit or specified other proof may be provided as evidence of a domestic partnership to qualify for an exemption from the inheritance tax on the receipt of interest in real property held in joint tenancy that passes from a decedent to a domestic partner.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915362/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {915362/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text - Chapter - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page