Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Revising the composition of the Prince George's County Board of Education; providing for the appointment of specified members of the county board by the County Executive of Prince George's County and the Prince George's County Council; requiring the County Executive to appoint a chair and vice chair of the county board; establishing that, in Prince George's County, the county superintendent is the Chief Executive Officer (CEO) of the public school system; authorizing the CEO to consolidate schools under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305160/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444332/1
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (36-8)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {583429/1 Rejected (9-38)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {353724/1 Rejected (9-36)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (79-47)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {305160/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {444332/1 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (36-8) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {583429/1 Rejected (9-38) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {353724/1 Rejected (9-36) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7) 61A
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (79-47) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1002 through 3-1004, 3-105, 3-114, 4-101, 4-102, 4-120, 4-201, 4-201.1, 4-202, 4-204, 4-206, 4-401 through 4-403, 6-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM