Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing specified powers, duties, and responsibilities of the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring core service agencies, local addictions authorities, and local behavioral health authorities to submit a specified plan to the Director; authorizing the Director to deny approval of a local addictions authority or local behavioral health authority and cease funding or request the return of unspent funds under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {476684/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437375/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {476684/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {437375/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-1101, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1202.1, 10-1203, 10-1401, 10-1403, 10-1404, 10-207, 10-308, 10-309, 10-312, 10-515, 10-516, 10-517, 10-518, 10-520 through 10-523, 10-604, 10-630, 10-701, 10-901, 10-905, 10-908 through 10-913, 16-101, 16-201.2, 16-204, 19-2301, 4-307, 5-705, 5-803, 5-805, 7.5-101, 7.5-204, 7.5-205, 7.5-206, 7.5-301 through 7.5-304, 8-101, 8-402 through 8-404, 8-405, 8-406, 8-702, 8-703 )
(   8-101, 8-302, 8-406, 8-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM