Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Dumais, Frick, Luedtke, Pendergrass, and Wood
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from selling a tire to a consumer in the State as a new tire if the tire is a retreaded, previously used, or recycled tire or was manufactured more than 3 years before the date of sale; requiring a merchant who sells a specified tire to a consumer to provide a specified notice and specified disclosure to the consumer relating to tire age and safety; establishing a penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM