Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to require a specified manner and format for an application for a commission; requiring the Secretary to apply for a State and national criminal history records check under specified circumstances; requiring the Central Repository to forward to a specified applicant and the Secretary a printed statement of the applicant's criminal history information; providing that specified information obtained from the Central Repository is confidential and may only be used for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928177/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-7)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 48
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {928177/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (131-7) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301, 3-302, 3-304, 3-305, 3-310, 3-312, 3-313, 3-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM