Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Beidle, Bromwell, Cassilly, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Gaines, Holmes, S. Howard, Jacobs, Lafferty, Mautz, McIntosh, McKay, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, S. Robinson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring money in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund, beginning in fiscal year 2017, to be allocated in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring a minimum of $5,000,000 in the Trust Fund to be allocated to the Department of Agriculture annually for distribution to soil conservation districts to assist farmers and counties with nonpoint source pollution control projects; establishing the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-2A-01, 8-2A-02, 8-2A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM