Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Hettleman, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Stein, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public institution of higher education to require a student health center to provide during the regular hours of operation of the student health center on-site access to certain emergency contraception and contraceptive counseling or referrals for contraceptive counseling to other qualified health care providers; requiring a public institution of higher education to ensure the availability of certain emergency contraception at all times, such as through vending machines or other similar devices; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM