Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Clippinger, Cluster, Hough, Lee, McDermott, B. Robinson, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State's Attorney to be a party to, and have specified rights in, specified proceedings relating to the release of a person committed to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene as not criminally responsible under the test for criminal responsibility; providing for specified de novo hearings in specified release cases where the underlying crime is a specified crime of violence; authorizing a court considering a specified release to continue its hearing to take additional evidence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-114 through 3-120, 3-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM