Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Health Care for Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Health Care for Inmates in Correctional Facilities; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to meet at least monthly; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters related to health care for inmates in correctional facilities; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Health Care for Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study Health Care for Inmates in Correctional Facilities
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM