Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Child Fatality Review Team to enter into a certain agreement for secure storage of data and requiring the agreement to provide certain protection and address certain issues; requiring a certain entity to comply with certain confidentiality requirements; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop a certain list of certain perinatal hospice programs; authorizing a perinatal hospice program to request that the Department include certain information on the Department's website; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page