Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Bromwell, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Luedtke, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the sale, transfer, offer to sell or transfer, barter, trade, or auction of dogs and cats at specified locations; authorizing animal control officers and officers of specified humane organizations to enforce specified provisions of the Act; providing that a retail pet store may only offer for sale a dog or cat obtained from specified persons; requiring a retail pet store to post on each dog's cage specified information and maintain a record that includes information about the breeder or dealer, if applicable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0663
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363590/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-11)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {363590/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (128-11) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-104, 19-701, 19-702, 19-702.1, 19-703, 19-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM