Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Branch, Carey, Clippinger, Kelly, Lisanti, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket issuer from using a nontransferable ticketing system except under specified circumstances; prohibiting a purchaser or a seller of a ticket from being penalized, discriminated against, or denied access to an event under specified circumstances; authorizing a ticket issuer, an operator of a venue, or an agent of the operator to maintain and enforce specified policies, establish specified limits, revoke or restrict specified tickets, and opt not to sell tickets in a specified form under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001 through 14-4003, 14-4002, 14-4003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM