Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the required elements for murder in the first degree under certain circumstances; authorizing a person convicted of felony murder to petition for a review of a certain conviction under certain circumstances; requiring a court to hold a hearing at a certain time to make a certain determination; requiring a certain person to notify certain persons of a certain application for review of conviction; requiring a court to take certain actions under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/27/2021 2/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page