Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, McIntosh, Atterbeary, Bridges, Brooks, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Ghrist, Glenn, Haynes, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Jones, Kelly, Lierman, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Sydnor, Guyton, Cain, Wilkins, Patterson, Luedtke, Smith, Walker, Washington, Mosby, Turner, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, Feldmark, and Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the intent of the General Assembly to promote gender diversity in corporate management and boardrooms; requiring a certain entity submitting an annual report to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to include information relating to the number of female members of the board and the total number of members of the board; providing the Act does not apply to a privately held company if at least 75% of the company's shareholders are family members; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0911
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {943120/2 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-34)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {269239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-5)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-29)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report or Nonprofit Sales and Use Tax Exemption Application
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {355065/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Floor Amendment {943120/2 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-34) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {269239/1 Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (37-5) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (111-29) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text - Chapter - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page