Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide DNA Data Base System - Admissibility of DNA Match Evidence
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor and Vallario
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to provide that a match obtained between a specified evidence sample and a specified data base entry may be used as probable cause and is not admissible at a criminal trial to prove the guilt of the defendant who is the subject of the prosecution unless confirmed by additional testing.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM