Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Hettleman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Morhaim, Patterson, Sample-Hughes, Turner, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Mattress Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before July 1, 2017, and in accordance with specified requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve specified plans,including a specified assessment, submitted in accordance with the Mattress Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of specified mattresses under specified circumstances beginning October 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1702, 9-1707, 9-1733, 9-1734 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM