Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow under a permit for roadside tree care the maintenance or removal of a tree to eliminate a hazard, to enable necessary roadway improvements, and for locally zoned development and land use requirements; prohibiting the Department from authorizing under a permit the maintenance or removal of a roadside tree for specified purposes; requiring an applicant for a permit to remove a roadside tree to demonstrate that a reasonable effort has been made to protect and to preserve the tree; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {370610/1 Adopted 57
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 58
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-401, 5-401.1, 5-402, 5-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM