Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Afzali, Eckardt, Frank, Myers, Parrott, Schulz, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to make available to an applicant for a driver's license, identification card, or moped operator's permit the opportunity to upgrade the document to be an enhanced identification document; establishing that the Administration may issue an enhanced identification document only to specified individuals who provide specified documentation; requiring an individual who applies for an enhanced identification document to provide to the Administration a specified biometric identifier; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM